+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 24, 1975 in the Senate:
- Public law 94-134.
- Signed by President.
On November 12, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On November 12, 1975 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
- Cleared for White House
On November 12, 1975 in the Senate:
- Senate receded and concurred in certain House amendment.
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On November 11, 1975 in the Senate:
- House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendment with amendment.
- House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendment.
- Motion to recommit to the Committee of Conference with instructions rejected in Senate, roll call #686 .
On November 11, 1975 in the House:
- House agreed to conference report.
On November 6, 1975 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-636.
On September 17, 1975 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On July 25, 1975 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #332 .
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On July 22, 1975 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, S. Rept. 94-291.
On July 11, 1975 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations.
On July 10, 1975 in the House:
- Measure passed House, roll call #375 .
- Motion to recommit to Committee on Appropriations rejected in House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On June 26, 1975 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 94-331.
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor