+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On August 2, 1994 in the House:
- See H.R.3600 .
On August 10, 1993 in the House:
- See H.R.2264 .
On March 4, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations.
On February 24, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and Competitiveness.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On February 17, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic and Commercial Law.
On February 4, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor