+ − Summary
+ − Actions (20)
On September 25, 1981 in the House:
- For Further Action See H.R.4566 .
On September 16, 1981 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 17, 1981 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On June 23, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 15, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 5, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Commerce.
- Executive Comment Received From Commerce.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 20, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From State.
- Executive Comment Received From State.
On April 16, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From US Trade Rep.
- Executive Comment Received From US Trade Rep.
On April 7, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Treasury.
- Executive Comment Received From Treasury.
On March 24, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From US Intl Trade Comm.
- Executive Comment Received From US Intl Trade Comm.
On February 13, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State, Treasury, Commerce, Labor, US Intl Trade Comm, US Trade Rep.
On February 2, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
On January 13, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor