+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On November 17, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5851)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8326.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5851-5853)
- Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On November 16, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 476.
- Committee on Financial Services discharged.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-578, Part I.
On September 30, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged.
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
On September 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House