+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On November 17, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5847-5848)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8266.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5847-5849)
- Mr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On November 16, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 478.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-580.
On September 30, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged.
On September 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
On September 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor