+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On October 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On October 1, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5149-5150)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8225.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5149-5151)
- Ms. Bass moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 433.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-533.
On September 15, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Introduced in House