+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On September 21, 2022 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 117-482.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 372.
On September 20, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to the Consensus Calendar, Calendar No. 3.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported Without Recommendation by Voice Vote.
On September 19, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Social Security Discharged.
On July 15, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to place bill on Consensus Calendar filed by Mr. Davis, Rodney.
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
+ − Sponsors (298)
Type:
Primary Sponsor