+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 30, 1999 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 920 .
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Commerce discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate in lieu of S. 920 with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On March 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On March 16, 1999 in the House:
- The Speaker designated the Honorable Cliff Stearns to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- Rule H. Res. 104 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 104 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 819 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. After general debate the bill shall be considered for amendment under the five-minute rule. The Chairman may accord priority on the basis of whether the Member offering an amendment has caused it to be printed in the Congressional Record. The Chairman may postpone a request for a recorded vote on any amendment; and reduce to five minutes the minimum time for voting on any postponed question that follows another electronic vote. Measure will be considered read. Bill is open to amendments.
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 104 and Rule XXIII.
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 819 .
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 819 .
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 403 - 3 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On March 10, 1999 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 104 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 819 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. After general debate the bill shall be considered for amendment under the five-minute rule. The Chairman may accord priority on the basis of whether the Member offering an amendment has caused it to be printed in the Congressional Record. The Chairman may postpone a request for a recorded vote on any amendment; and reduce to five minutes the minimum time for voting on any postponed question that follows another electronic vote. Measure will be considered read. Bill is open to amendments.
On March 4, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 24.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-42 .
On March 2, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor