+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 30, 2001 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 107-12.
- Signed by President.
On May 18, 2001 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On May 15, 2001 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 14, 2001 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On May 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On May 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 40.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Hatch without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On March 22, 2001 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 802 .
- Mr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 414 - 0 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On March 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On March 12, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 10.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-15 .
On March 8, 2001 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 28, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor