+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 3, 1987 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-150.
- Signed by President.
On October 27, 1987 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 13, 1987 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 13, 1987 in the Senate:
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On October 6, 1987 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 1, 1987 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
On September 25, 1987 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 349.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with amendments. With written report No. 100-185.
On September 16, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On July 9, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Department of Agriculture. Unfavorable.
On May 21, 1987 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 100-132.
On May 18, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Interior Department, Agriculture Department, OMB.
On April 22, 1987 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On April 21, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On April 9, 1987 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 40.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-49.
On April 1, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 17, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 5, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 5, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On January 28, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor