+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 23, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-219 , Part I.
On July 20, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Water and Power Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
On June 23, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Natural Resources
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor