+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-15.
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 48.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 793 .
- Mr. Ross moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 394 - 0, 1 Present .
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy .
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor