+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 3, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-370.
- Signed by President.
On September 24, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On September 23, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On September 23, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On September 18, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On September 18, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On September 16, 1980 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #541 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On September 10, 1980 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with amendment, H. Rept. 96-1314.
On July 24, 1980 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor