+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4685)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7795.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4685-4687)
- Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On September 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
On July 30, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor