+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On February 21, 1978 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-235.
- Signed by President.
On February 10, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On February 9, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On February 6, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On February 6, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On January 30, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Governmental Affairs, S. Rept. 95-622.
On September 28, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On September 26, 1977 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On September 20, 1977 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the District of Columbia, H. Rept. 95-611.
On June 14, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the District of Columbia.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor