+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On December 5, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-499.
- Signed by President.
On December 4, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On December 4, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On December 3, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On December 3, 1980 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report, roll call #502 .
On December 3, 1980 in the House:
- House agreed to conference report, roll call #657 .
On November 26, 1980 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 96-1479.
On September 18, 1980 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
- Motion to instruct House Conferees passed House, roll call #559 .
On September 17, 1980 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended .
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Committee on the Budget discharged in Senate.
On September 8, 1980 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Budget.
On September 4, 1980 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #519 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On July 15, 1980 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Budget, H. Rept. 96-1167.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor