+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On August 25, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Governmental Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 95-1163.
On September 28, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On September 26, 1977 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On September 20, 1977 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the District of Columbia with amendment, H. Rept. 95-610.
On June 13, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the District of Columbia.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor