+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On October 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-38.
On October 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On July 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
On June 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On June 21, 2011 in the House:
- Mr. Farenthold moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 771 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 398 - 0 .
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy .
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor