+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 30, 1975 in the Senate:
- Public law 94-46.
- Signed by President.
On June 27, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On June 27, 1975 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On June 26, 1975 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On June 26, 1975 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendments.
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Committee on Finance discharged in Senate.
On June 25, 1975 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Finance.
On June 24, 1975 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On June 16, 1975 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Ways and Means, H. Rept. 94-297.
On June 9, 1975 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor