+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On December 5, 1980 in the House:
- Private Law 96-67.
- Signed by President.
On November 26, 1980 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On November 20, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On November 20, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On September 30, 1980 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources, S. Rept. 96-1008.
On August 21, 1980 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On August 19, 1980 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
On July 29, 1980 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs, H. Rept. 96-1203.
On June 30, 1980 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor