+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On June 22, 1974 in the House:
- Private Law 93-76.
- Signed by President.
On June 18, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On June 13, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On June 13, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On June 12, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 93-916.
On April 3, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On April 2, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, with an amendment to the title.
On February 28, 1974 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, H. Rept. 93-837.
On May 9, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor