+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 18 (Roll no. 250). (text: 06/07/2022 CR H5255)
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 18 (Roll no. 250).
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5399-5400)
On June 7, 2022 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7664.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5255-5256)
- Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 248.
- Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 117-330.
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
- Introduced in House