+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
On June 16, 2022 in the House:
- House amendment offered/reported by: Amendment (A003) offered by Ms. Spanberger.(consideration: CR H5629-5631; text: CR H5629)
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
- Amendment in the nature of a substitute reported by the House Committee on Rules.
- On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Khanna amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
- Amendment agreed to by House: On agreeing to the Khanna amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
- House amendment offered/reported by: Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Khanna.(consideration: CR H5627-5629; text: CR H5627-5628)
- Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Khanna. (consideration: CR H5627-5629; text: CR H5627-5628)
- The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) pursuant to the rule.
On June 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 16, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment agreed to by House: On agreeing to the Spanberger amendment (A003) Agreed to by voice vote.
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Spanberger amendment (A003) Agreed to by voice vote.
- House amendment offered
- On agreeing to the Khanna amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
- Amendment (A003) offered by Ms. Spanberger. (consideration: CR H5629-5631; text: CR H5629)
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
On June 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 221 - 204 (Roll no. 277).
On June 16, 2022 in the House:
- The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A003) pursuant to the rule.
- On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 206 - 218 (Roll no. 276).
- The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
- Mrs. Cammack moved to recommit to the Committee on Agriculture. (text: CR H5631)
- Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 221 - 204 (Roll no. 277).
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1170, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Spanberger amendment No. 2.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1170, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Khanna amendment No. 1.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 7606.
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2543, H.R. 2773 and H.R. 7606. Resolution provides for one hour of general debate on each bill and one motion to recommit. Rule also amends House Resolution 188 by striking "June 17, 2022" and inserting "June 22, 2022".
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1170. (consideration: CR H5615-5632; text: CR H5615-5618)
- On agreeing to the Spanberger amendment (A003) Agreed to by voice vote.
On June 14, 2022 in the House:
- Rule H. Res. 1170 passed House.
On June 13, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1170 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2543, H.R. 2773 and H.R. 7606. Resolution provides for one hour of general debate on each bill and one motion to recommit. Rule also amends House Resolution 188 by striking "June 17, 2022" and inserting "June 22, 2022".
On June 9, 2022 in the House:
- Supplemental report filed by the Committee on Agriculture, H. Rept. 117-357, Part II.
On June 7, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 270.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 117-357.
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 21.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Discharged.
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (4)
H.Amdt.228
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.229
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
All Actions
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.230
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.