+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On July 17, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-311.
- Signed by President.
On July 7, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On July 6, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On July 2, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On July 2, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On June 30, 1980 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar in Senate.
On June 26, 1980 in the House:
- Measure passed House, roll call #374 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs, H. Rept. 96-1135.
On June 12, 1980 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor