+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Garrett asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 756, a bill originally introduced by former Representative Chaffetz, for purposes of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor