+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On October 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On October 25, 1999 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 754 .
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Bliley moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 390 - 2 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On October 19, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 233.
- Reported by the Committee on Commerce. H. Rept. 106-399 .
On September 29, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection Discharged.
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection.
On February 11, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor