+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On June 27, 1973 in the House:
- Motion to override veto failed of passage in House, roll call #300 .
- Vetoed by President.
On June 26, 1973 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
- Cleared for White House
On June 26, 1973 in the Senate:
- Senate receded and concurred in certain House Amendments.
- Senate agreed to conference report, roll call #227 .
On June 25, 1973 in the House:
- House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments.
- House agreed to conference report.
On June 19, 1973 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-295.
On June 5, 1973 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On June 4, 1973 in the House:
- Unanimous consent request to schedule conference objected to in House.
On May 31, 1973 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #163 .
On May 18, 1973 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, S. Rept. 93-160.
On May 14, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations.
On May 10, 1973 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #141 .
On May 3, 1973 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 93-164.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor