+ − Summary
+ − Actions (20)
On September 28, 1984 in the Senate:
- Became Private Law No: 98-17.
- Signed by President.
On September 17, 1984 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On September 12, 1984 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On September 7, 1984 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On September 7, 1984 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On August 8, 1984 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1109.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment. With written report No. 98-584.
On August 2, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 11, 1984 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Administrative Practice&Procedure. Approved for full committee consideration without amendment favorably.
On November 17, 1983 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Administrative Practice&Procedure.
On November 15, 1983 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On November 15, 1983 in the House:
- Passed House by Unanimous Consent.
- Called up by House on Call of Private Calendar.
On November 1, 1983 in the House:
- Passed Over by House Without Prejudice.
- Called up by House on Call of Private Calendar.
On October 21, 1983 in the House:
- Placed on Private Calendar No: 11.
- Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 98-429.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On January 6, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor