+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On April 12, 1974 in the House:
- Private Law 93-59.
- Signed by President.
On April 3, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On April 2, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On April 2, 1974 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendment.
On March 1, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended, with an amendment to the title.
On February 27, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, S. Rept. 93-697.
On November 7, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On November 6, 1973 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
On October 9, 1973 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 93-550.
On April 30, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor