+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On August 6, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Army.
On August 4, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Army.
On April 30, 1987 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 100-75 .
On April 23, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 19, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Housing and Memorial Affairs.
On February 20, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From American Battle Monuments Comm.
On February 11, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation.
On February 6, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
On February 3, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from American Battle Monuments Comm.
On January 22, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor