+ − Summary
+ − Actions (18)
On November 2, 1983 in the Senate:
- Became Private Law No: 98-3.
- Signed by President.
On October 24, 1983 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 21, 1983 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 21, 1983 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On October 6, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment. With written report No. 98-268.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 461.
On October 4, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 22, 1983 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Administrative Practice&Procedure. Approved for full committee consideration without amendment favorably.
On May 12, 1983 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Administrative Practice&Procedure.
On May 5, 1983 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On May 3, 1983 in the House:
- Passed House by Unanimous Consent.
- Called up by House on Call of Private Calendar.
On April 14, 1983 in the House:
- Placed on Private Calendar No: 4.
- Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 98-58.
- Ordered to be Reported.
On January 6, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor