+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 23, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-586.
- Signed by President.
On December 11, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 10, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On December 10, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On December 5, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On December 5, 1980 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendments.
On December 4, 1980 in the Senate:
- Call of calendar in Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On November 21, 1980 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources with amendment, S. Rept. 96-1026.
On September 10, 1980 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On September 8, 1980 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On May 16, 1980 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs, H. Rept. 96-1023.
On May 8, 1980 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor