+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On October 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On October 28, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8513-8514)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 728.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8513-8516)
- Ms. Schakowsky moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 171.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-216.
On July 17, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 11, 2019 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (130)
Type:
Primary Sponsor