+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On October 11, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Armed Services.
On October 10, 1978 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by consent calendar in House.
On October 4, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 95-1708.
On June 27, 1977 in the House:
- Rereferred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Committee on Armed Services discharged in House.
On May 16, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor