+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 14, 2008 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 110-413.
- Signed by President.
On October 6, 2008 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 2, 2008 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 1, 2008 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On September 29, 2008 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
- Committee on Financial Services discharged.
- Ms. Moore asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
On September 28, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor