+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On September 27, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 717 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Duncan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 29, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 163.
- Committee on Resources discharged.
- House Committee on Resources Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than July 29, 1999.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-273 , Part I.
On March 18, 1999 in the House:
- See H.R.1000 .
On March 11, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 9, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
On February 11, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to House Resources
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor