+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 362 - 56 (Roll no. 160). (text: 05/10/2022 CR H4750-4751)
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 362 - 56 (Roll no. 160).
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4838-4839)
On May 10, 2022 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7081.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4750-4752)
- Mr. Garcia (IL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 237.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 117-317.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor