+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 27, 1974 in the House:
- Public law 93-555.
- Signed by President.
On December 16, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 12, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On December 12, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On December 11, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs, S. Rept. 93-1328.
On December 10, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
On December 9, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
On December 3, 1974 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with amendment, H. Rept. 93-1511.
On April 16, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor