+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-604.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 437.
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsors (117)
Type:
Primary Sponsor