+ − Actions (14)
On September 30, 1982 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-274.
- Signed by President.
On September 28, 1982 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On September 24, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On September 24, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 23, 1982 in the Senate:
- Ordered held at desk until close of business September 24, 1982.
On September 22, 1982 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and held at the desk until the close of business September 23, 1982.
On September 20, 1982 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- House Committee on Education and Labor Discharged by Suspension of Rules.
On September 16, 1982 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 8, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor