+ − Actions (18)
On January 8, 1983 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-439.
- Signed by President.
On January 3, 1983 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On December 21, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Agriculture discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On December 20, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On September 28, 1982 in the House:
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
On September 28, 1982 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
On September 26, 1982 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 549.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 97-877.
On September 23, 1982 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 21, 1982 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 26, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Department Operations, Research, and Foreign Agriculture.
On August 18, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor