+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 362.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-217.
On October 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H67-69)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 70.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H67-70)
- Mr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House