+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Rule H. Res. 547 passed House.
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 547 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on H.R. 3408 . All points of order against consideration of the bill are waived. Specified amendments printed in part A of the report accompanying this resolution are in order. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on H.R. 3813 . All points of order against consideration of the bill are waived. Specified amendments printed in part B of the report accompanying this resolution are in order. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on H.R. 7 .
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 277.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-397 .
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 24.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor