+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On December 27, 2022 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 117-300.
- Signed by President.
On December 23, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 20, 2022 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7302-7303)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5107-5108)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6961.
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5142)
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 12 (Roll no. 216).
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 12 (Roll no. 216). (text: CR H5107)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Discharged.
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Introduced in House