+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 14, 2022 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-640, Part I.
On July 13, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
On June 16, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
- Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor