+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On July 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 1254, and the motion offered by Mr. Kildee, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 623, as amended; H.R. 3952, as amended; H.R. 3962, as amended; H.R. 4551; H.R. 5313, as amended; H.R. 6933; H.R. 7132, as amended; H.R. 7361; H.R. 7569; H.R. 7624, as amended; H.R. 7733, as amended; and H.R. 7981, as amended. (consideration: CR H7197-7211, H7219-7220, H7223-7237; text: 07/26/2022 CR H7091)
On July 27, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 1254, and the motion offered by Mr. Kildee, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 623, as amended; H.R. 3952, as amended; H.R. 3962, as amended; H.R. 4551; H.R. 5313, as amended; H.R. 6933; H.R. 7132, as amended; H.R. 7361; H.R. 7569; H.R. 7624, as amended; H.R. 7733, as amended; and H.R. 7981, as amended.(consideration: CR H7197-7211, H7219-7220, H7223-7237; text: 07/26/2022 CR H7091)
- Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1254, proceedings on H.R. 6933 are considered vacated.
On July 26, 2022 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6933.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7091-7092)
- Mr. Beyer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On June 14, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 278.
- Reported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 117-367.
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor