+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 391 - 0 (Roll no. 425).
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9747)
On November 29, 2018 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Comer objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6901.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9723-9725; text of measure as reported in House: CR H9723-9725)
- Mr. Comer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On October 12, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 771.
- Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-987.
On September 27, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Introduced in House