+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On March 19, 1990 in the House:
- For Further Action See H.R.4300 .
On March 14, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 13, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 7, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 1, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 21, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On September 27, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 27, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law.
On January 27, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor