+ − Actions (13)
On August 3, 1982 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From State.
On July 27, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Oceanography.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment.
On July 12, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Commerce, Transportation and Tourism.
On July 9, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Surface Transportation.
- Executive Comment Requested from ICC, DOT, OMB.
On June 30, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Merchant Marine.
- Executive Comment Received From DOT, State.
On June 29, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Monopolies and Commercial Law.
On June 24, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor