+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On May 23, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 421 - 0 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 67 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 15, 2007 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Unanimous Consent .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
On January 4, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor